Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Federal National Mortgage Association, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Stiene, Charles, against Kenneth Frate, Village Mill Condominium-Bd Mgrs, in the jurisdiction of Rockland County, NY, . Rockland County, NY Superior Courts with _ Fsp-R presiding.
Case Number |
Judge_ Fsp-R Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 30, 2015 |
CategoryForeclosure (Residential Mortgage) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationRockland County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Case Cycle Time192 days |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 24, 2015SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 30, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 08, 2016 | Hearing |
Settled - Other Foreclosure Set. PT.(Rockland) Supreme Initial (first time on), FCP(10:00AM) (Conversion) Judge: Part (Rockland), Foreclosure Set |
|
November 17, 2015 |
NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) DISCONTINUANCE OF ACTION AND CANCELLING LIS PENDENS |
||
October 08, 2015 | RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE | ||
October 08, 2015 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
September 24, 2015 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE KENNETH FRATE (DENVER CO) |
||
July 24, 2015 |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING STATEMENT OF AUTH |
||
July 24, 2015 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OCCUPANT |
||
July 24, 2015 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE KENNETH FRATE |
||
July 24, 2015 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE BOARD OF MANAGERS OF VILLAGE MILL |
||
June 30, 2015 |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.