Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Harley-Davidson Credit Corp., filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Powietrzynski, Aleksander P, against Bruce D Rifflard, Tracy Lowther, in the jurisdiction of Rockland County, NY, . Rockland County, NY Superior Courts Rockland County Supreme Court with Gerald E Loehr presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGerald E Loehr Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJune 29, 2015 |
CategoryConsumer Credit (Non-Card) Transaction |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 17, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions15 days |
Filing LocationRockland County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
|
Filing Court HouseRockland County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time14 days |
ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: June 29, 2015ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: July 09, 2015ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001)
Date: June 29, 2015ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001)
Date: July 01, 2015ORDER - OTHER
Date: July 14, 2015SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 29, 2015RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: June 29, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: June 29, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 24, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY | |
July 14, 2015 | Docket Event |
ORDER - OTHER Order to Dismiss Without Prejudice and Cancel Bond |
|
July 13, 2015 | Hearing |
Gerald E. Loehr ORDER TO DISMISS, & CANCEL BOND (Conversion) Judge: Loehr, Hon. Gerald E. |
|
July 13, 2015 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #001) Gerald E. Loehr TURNOVER COLLATERAL, TO PLF - APP 10:00 (Conversion) Judge: Loehr, Hon. Gerald E. |
|
July 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Proposed order to dismiss without prejudice and cancel bond |
|
July 01, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001) | |
June 30, 2015 | Motion |
(Motion #001) Decided: 07/13/2015Decided Before Justice: Loehr, Hon. Gerald E. Answer demanded: No Judge: Loehr, Hon. Gerald E. |
|
June 30, 2015 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #001) Gerald E. Loehr TURNOVER COLLATERAL, TO PLAINTIFF 10:00 (Conversion) Judge: Loehr, Hon. Gerald E. |
|
June 29, 2015 | Docket Event |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) PROPOSED ORDER |
|
June 29, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.