Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Us Bank Na-Tr, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Bebirian, Nicholas John, Briant-Napier, Anita Kay, Conway, Erin Mccall, Katz, Jordan S, against Beryl Braun Aka, Beryl D Braun, Jpmorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Richard R Zayas-Referee, Stewart Braun, (total of 5) See All represented by Kolber, Allen A, in the jurisdiction of Rockland County, NY, . Rockland County, NY Superior Courts Rockland County Supreme Court with Sherri L Eisenpress presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSherri L Eisenpress Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJune 29, 2015 |
CategoryForeclosure (Residential Mortgage) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1144 days |
Filing LocationRockland County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Filing Court HouseRockland County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time1144 days |
ORDER - OTHER
Date: June 01, 2017JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE
Date: August 16, 2018STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: May 31, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 15, 2019 | Hearing |
Sherri L. Eisenpress CONTROL (9:45 A.M.), NO APPS DECISION (Conversion) Judge: Eisenpress, Hon. Sherri L. |
|
March 18, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER - VACATING JUDGMENT entered in the office of the County Clerk on March 18, 2019 | |
March 18, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER - VACATING JUDGMENT (Motion #003) | |
January 11, 2019 | Hearing |
Fully Submitted (Motion #003) Sherri L. Eisenpress (Motions) Judge: Eisenpress, Hon. Sherri L. |
|
December 07, 2018 | Hearing |
Held Sherri L. Eisenpress Supreme Trial, CONF (9:45 A.M.) (Conversion) Judge: Eisenpress, Hon. Sherri L. |
|
November 28, 2018 | Motion |
Discontinue (Motion #003) Decided: 03/18/2019Closed Before Justice: Eisenpress, Hon. Sherri L. Answer demanded: No Judge: Eisenpress, Hon. Sherri L. |
|
November 27, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #003) | |
November 27, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #003) | |
November 27, 2018 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT (Motion #003) | |
November 27, 2018 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION (Motion #003) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.