Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Peerless Insurance Co And Excelsior Insurance Co, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Maidenbaum, Jeffrey A, against Imperial Marble & Granite, Mem Co Llc-Dba, represented by Rosenberg, Jeremy, in the jurisdiction of Rockland County, NY, . Rockland County, NY Superior Courts Rockland County Supreme Court with Thomas Walsh presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeThomas Walsh Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJune 26, 2015 |
CategoryContract (Non-Commercial) |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationRockland County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseRockland County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time719 days |
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: August 02, 2016RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: December 04, 2015STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: January 04, 2016LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #001)
Date: March 03, 2016COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: August 03, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: March 03, 2016STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (POST RJI)
Date: July 13, 2017SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 26, 2015ANSWER
Date: September 17, 2015NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: December 04, 2015LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #001)
Date: February 02, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 13, 2017 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (POST RJI) | |
June 14, 2017 | Hearing |
Settled Thomas E. Walsh (Trials) PTC (9:30 A.M.) (Conversion) Judge: Walsh II, Hon. Thomas E. |
|
June 07, 2017 | Hearing |
Held Thomas E. Walsh (Trials) Supreme Trial, PTC (9:30 A.M.) (Conversion) Judge: Walsh II, Hon. Thomas E. |
|
December 12, 2016 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
December 12, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY | |
December 09, 2016 | Hearing |
Held Thomas E. Walsh (Trials) Supreme Trial, CC (9:30 A.M.) (Conversion) Judge: Walsh II, Hon. Thomas E. |
|
September 09, 2016 | Hearing |
Held Thomas E. Walsh (Trials) Supreme Initial (first time on), PTC (9:30 A.M.) (Conversion) Judge: Walsh II, Hon. Thomas E. |
|
August 02, 2016 | Docket Event | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001) | |
March 25, 2016 | Hearing |
Fully Submitted (Motion #001) Thomas E. Walsh (Motions) Judge: Walsh II, Hon. Thomas E. |
|
March 04, 2016 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #001) Thomas E. Walsh (Motions) Judge: Walsh II, Hon. Thomas E. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.