Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Eric Li, Hope Chung, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Smith, Alden B, against Donna Russo, represented by Gavioli, Wayne A, in the jurisdiction of Rockland County, NY, . Rockland County, NY Superior Courts Rockland County Supreme Court with Linda Christopher presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLinda Christopher Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJune 25, 2015 |
CategoryContract (Non-Commercial) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions146 days |
Filing LocationRockland County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseRockland County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time146 days |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #002)
Date: July 15, 2016ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - CONFORMED COPY (Motion #002)
Date: July 18, 2016ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #002)
Date: August 02, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 08, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEAL/RADI/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE (Motion #003) | |
January 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of service of Notice of Entry & Order |
|
January 10, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry w Order attached | |
January 09, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER - OTHER (Motion #002) | |
December 30, 2016 | Docket Event |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Ltr Hon Christopher |
|
December 30, 2016 | Docket Event |
TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS - CERTIFIED Transcript of Proceedings - Hon. Linda Christopher, JSC |
|
December 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Proposed Order |
|
December 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Ltr Hon. Christopher enc hard copy of Order w Not of Settlement |
|
December 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT W/PROPOSED ORDER/COUNTER ORDER Notice of Settlement |
|
December 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.