Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Dorothea White, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Lapp, Ira Harley, Neimark, Marshall Adam, against Pearl River Shop-Rite Associates Inc, represented by Smith, Kirby Jermaine, in the jurisdiction of Rockland County, NY, . Rockland County, NY Superior Courts with Robert M Berliner presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert M Berliner Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 14, 2020 |
CategoryTorts - Other (Premises) |
Last RefreshedDecember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationRockland County, NY |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: November 25, 2020STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 01, 2021NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY
Date: November 01, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 01, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
November 01, 2021 |
NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY NOTE OF ISSUE |
||
October 05, 2021 | Hearing |
11:40am ptc virtual
Judge: Berliner, Hon. Robert M. |
|
July 22, 2021 | Hearing |
Held 9:50am ptc virtual (teams) Judge: Berliner, Hon. Robert M. |
|
February 02, 2021 | Hearing |
Held 11:30am PC virtual (Teams) Judge: Berliner, Hon. Robert M. |
|
January 25, 2021 |
COURT NOTICE Filing on Behalf of - Honorable Robert M. Berliner |
||
December 07, 2020 |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST Req for PC, Affirm GF |
||
December 07, 2020 |
RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE RJI |
||
December 07, 2020 |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Statement of efile - Rockland |
||
November 25, 2020 |
DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS Demand for Verified Bill of Particulars |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.