Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Chelsea P Strazza Exr, Daniel E Strazza Exr, Paula Strazza Est Of, filed a(n) Tort case represented by Neimark, Marshall A, against Nyack Village Of, represented by Patel, Sheel D., Pitcoff, Kenneth E, in the jurisdiction of Rockland County, NY, . Rockland County, NY Superior Courts Rockland County Supreme Court with Robert M Berliner presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert M Berliner Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 24, 2015 |
CategoryTort |
Last RefreshedJuly 31, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationRockland County, NY |
|
Filing Court HouseRockland County Supreme Court |
Case Cycle Time1035 days |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: February 02, 2016SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 24, 2015DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: February 02, 2016ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001)
Date: April 06, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #001)
Date: August 07, 2015DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: July 10, 2015RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: August 07, 2015NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: August 07, 2015ANSWER
Date: July 10, 2015ORDER - AMENDING CAPTION (Motion #002)
Date: April 24, 2018ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #002)
Date: April 12, 2018DECISION ON MOTION -SUBMIT ORD / JGMT (Motion #002)
Date: April 12, 2018NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: February 28, 2018LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: September 18, 2017STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 09, 2016LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: March 09, 2016STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 24, 2016LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: February 24, 2016STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 02, 2016ORDER - (PROPOSED) "SUBMIT ORDER" PER JUDGES DECISION (Motion #001)
Date: September 30, 2015DECISION ON MOTION -SUBMIT ORD / JGMT (Motion #001)
Date: September 22, 2015STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 24, 2015STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: June 24, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 24, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER - AMENDING CAPTION (Motion #002) | |
April 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #002) PROPOSED ORDER TO AMEND CAPTION |
|
April 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
DECISION ON MOTION -SUBMIT ORD / JGMT (Motion #002) Motion granted without opposition - submit order |
|
March 30, 2018 | Hearing |
Fully Submitted - No Opposition (Motion #002) Robert M. Berliner (Mtn) Judge: Berliner, Hon. Robert M. |
|
March 05, 2018 | Motion |
(Motion #002) Decided: 04/11/2018Granted Before Justice: Berliner, Hon. Robert M. Answer demanded: No Judge: Berliner, Hon. Robert M. |
|
February 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #002) AOS FOR MOTION |
|
February 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #002) S&C FOR MOTION |
|
February 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #002) LETTERS OF TESTAMENTARY |
|
February 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION (Motion #002) AFFIRMATION FOR MOTION |
|
February 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #002) 3-30-18 NOTICE OF MOTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.