Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Executive Associates North Ii Llc, filed a(n) Assessment Challenge - Tax case represented by Goodfriend, Mark F., against Ramapo Town Of, Ramapo Town Of Bd Of Assessment, represented by Finkelstein, Beth, in the jurisdiction of Rockland County, NY, . Rockland County, NY Superior Courts with Robert M Berliner presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert M Berliner Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 14, 2020 |
CategoryReal Property - Tax Certiorari |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationRockland County, NY |
Matter TypeAssessment Challenge |
PETITION
Date: July 14, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 11, 2022NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: February 28, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 22, 2022 | JUDGMENT | ||
July 01, 2022 | STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (POST RJI) | ||
April 25, 2022 | COURT NOTICE | ||
March 30, 2022 | SUBPOENA - SO ORDERED | ||
March 15, 2022 | SUBPOENA ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) | ||
February 28, 2022 |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI) Notice of Appearance |
||
February 28, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service |
||
February 28, 2022 |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND Response to Notice to Admit |
||
February 23, 2022 | NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION) | ||
February 23, 2022 |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND Response to Notice to Admit |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.