Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Christiana Trust, Wilmington Savings Fund Society Fsb-Dba, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Coletti, Sara A, Komosinski, Richard F, Lee, Michel, Manfro, Jordan Jayce, Olson, Karen B, (total of 5) See All against American Express Centurion Bank, Helen S Kagan Aka, Kenneth Murphy-Referee, Sue Kagan, represented by Silverberg, Stephen Carl, in the jurisdiction of Rockland County, NY, . Rockland County, NY Superior Courts Rockland County Supreme Court with David S Zuckerman presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid S Zuckerman Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJune 23, 2015 |
CategoryForeclosure (Residential Mortgage) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions617 days |
Filing LocationRockland County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Filing Court HouseRockland County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time680 days |
JUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED) (Motion #003)
Date: March 01, 2017ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #004)
Date: August 01, 2017ORDER - REFERENCE
Date: May 18, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 11, 2017 | Hearing |
David S. Zuckerman CONTROL (9:15 A.M.), NO APP S (Conversion) Judge: Zuckerman, Hon. David S. |
|
November 22, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY | |
November 09, 2017 | Hearing |
Adjourned David S. Zuckerman CONF (9:15 A.M.) (Conversion) Judge: Zuckerman, Hon. David S. |
|
September 01, 2017 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #004) David S. Zuckerman Judge: Zuckerman, Hon. David S. |
|
August 01, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #004) | |
August 01, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #004) | |
August 01, 2017 | Motion |
Discontinue (Motion #004) Decided: 11/27/2017Closed Before Justice: Zuckerman, Hon. David S. Answer demanded: No Judge: Zuckerman, Hon. David S. |
|
August 01, 2017 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #004) | |
August 01, 2017 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION (Motion #004) | |
June 01, 2017 | Hearing |
Adjourned Hon. Linda Christopher CONTROL (9:15 A.M.), NO APPS (Conversion) Judge: Christopher, Hon. Linda |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.