Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Ryder Transportation Services, Ryder Truck Rental Inc-Dba, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Bernstein, Michael Ira, Siegler, John Thomas, against United Rockland Stairs, Inc., in the jurisdiction of Rockland County, NY, . Rockland County, NY Superior Courts Rockland County Supreme Court.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJune 23, 2015 |
CategoryCommercial |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions106 days |
Filing LocationRockland County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
|
Filing Court HouseRockland County Supreme Court |
Case Cycle Time106 days |
JUDGMENT
Date: October 08, 2015SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 23, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 05, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | |
October 08, 2015 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT entered in the office of the County Clerk on October 07, 2015 | |
October 07, 2015 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | |
July 17, 2015 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE | |
June 23, 2015 | Docket Event | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.