Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Provident Bank, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Churgin, Joseph, against Jeanette Buono, Richard Buono, Rix Panoply, Inc, in the jurisdiction of Rockland County. This case was filed in Rockland County Superior Courts Rockland County Supreme Court with Alfred Weiner presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAlfred Weiner Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateSeptember 20, 2011 |
CategoryCommercial |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationRockland County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
|
Filing Court HouseRockland County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time63 days |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001)
Date: September 21, 2011ORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM (Motion #001)
Date: November 22, 2011RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: September 20, 2011Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 22, 2011 | Docket Event |
ORDER - MOTION - LONG FORM (Motion #001) Order Granting Plaintiff's Application |
|
October 12, 2011 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
September 22, 2011 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION | |
September 21, 2011 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001) | |
September 21, 2011 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001) | |
September 21, 2011 | Docket Event | EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) | |
September 21, 2011 | Docket Event | EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) | |
September 20, 2011 | Docket Event | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION | |
September 20, 2011 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION | |
September 20, 2011 | Docket Event | EXHIBIT(S) - H |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.