Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Midland Credit Management, Inc., filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Beh, Han Sheng, Stiller, Craig Scott, Winograd, Ian Zev, against Chaim Brull, represented by Zemel, Daniel, in the jurisdiction of Rockland County, NY, . Rockland County, NY Superior Courts with Thomas P Zugibe presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeThomas P Zugibe Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 02, 2020 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationRockland County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
ANSWER (AMENDED)
Date: August 21, 2020THIRD PARTY SUMMONS/COMPLAINT
Date: August 21, 2020SUBPOENA - SO ORDERED
Date: November 16, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 29, 2021 | Hearing |
(Motion #001) Motion Submission Part Judge: Zugibe, Hon. Thomas P. |
|
November 20, 2020 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #001) Motion Submission Part Judge: Zugibe, Hon. Thomas P. |
|
November 16, 2020 | SUBPOENA - SO ORDERED | ||
November 16, 2020 |
STIPULATION - OTHER (Motion #001) Extension of time to respond |
||
October 14, 2020 | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
October 14, 2020 |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #001) Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Arbitration |
||
October 14, 2020 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) Account Statement - 2/20/18 |
||
October 14, 2020 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Account Statement - 5/23/18 |
||
October 14, 2020 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Account Information |
||
October 14, 2020 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Bill of Sale |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.