Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Iris Cohen Exx, Sid Cohen Est Of, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Adams, Jeffrey M, Daiter, Ian Craig, against Abna I Realty Llc, Jaca Entertainment Corp, represented by Naparty, Matthew W., Stiefeld, Marc E, in the jurisdiction of Rockland County, NY, . Rockland County, NY Superior Courts with Rolf Thorsen presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRolf Thorsen Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 02, 2020 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (Trip And Fall) |
Last RefreshedJuly 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationRockland County, NY |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
ANSWER
Date: July 23, 2020SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 02, 2020STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: April 19, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 06, 2023 | COURT NOTICE | ||
January 04, 2023 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY Order with Notice of Entry of Appeal Decision |
||
July 21, 2022 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) | ||
April 01, 2022 | COURT NOTICE | ||
March 10, 2022 | NOTICE OF APPEAL/INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE | ||
March 08, 2022 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
March 08, 2022 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY Decision & Order |
||
December 09, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #003) Reply Affirmation |
||
December 08, 2021 |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND 3101(d) Alexander Mercer, MD |
||
November 29, 2021 |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND Amended Expert Witness Disclosure - Dagenhsein |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.