Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Ecolab Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Lubitz, Murray S, against Pelleh Poultry Corp., in the jurisdiction of Rockland County, NY, . Rockland County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJune 02, 2020 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions85 days |
Filing LocationRockland County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 02, 2020JUDGMENT
Date: January 12, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: August 26, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 08, 2021 | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT entered in the office of the County Clerk on July 08, 2021 | ||
July 08, 2021 | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT | ||
January 12, 2021 | JUDGMENT entered in the office of the County Clerk on January 12, 2021 | ||
August 26, 2020 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
August 26, 2020 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
July 02, 2020 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
June 02, 2020 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.