Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Cavalry Spv I, Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Langlois, Christopher P, against Jessica Hewitt, in the jurisdiction of Rockland County, NY, . Rockland County, NY Superior Courts Rockland County Supreme Court.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 21, 2020 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Non-Card) Transaction |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationRockland County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
Filing Court HouseRockland County Supreme Court |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: March 21, 2020JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: September 01, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 21, 2020SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT
Date: October 21, 2020202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING
Date: July 30, 2020AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 01, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 21, 2020 | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT | ||
September 01, 2020 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
September 01, 2020 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
July 30, 2020 | Docket Event | 202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING | |
July 21, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
March 21, 2020 | Docket Event | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.