Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Caster, Austin Robert, Gazzo, Nicole Carol, Pascuzzi, Ashley Marie, against Doris Gordon Heath, John C Heath, in the jurisdiction of Rockland County, NY, . Rockland County, NY Superior Courts Rockland County Supreme Court with Calendar Clerk presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCalendar Clerk Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 19, 2020 |
CategoryReal Property - Other (Contract (Non-Commercial)) |
Last RefreshedDecember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationRockland County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Filing Court HouseRockland County Supreme Court |
COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: March 19, 2020COMPLAINT (AMENDED) Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: July 08, 2020STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: June 01, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 22, 2021 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
June 22, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
June 08, 2021 | ORDER - OTHER | ||
May 28, 2021 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
December 01, 2020 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
December 01, 2020 |
RJI -RE: OTHER Stipulation and consent order expunging the Satisfaction of Mortgage |
||
December 01, 2020 | STIPULATION - OTHER | ||
August 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR Redacted per 22 NYCRR §202.5(e) |
|
July 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service by mail |
|
July 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
COMPLAINT (AMENDED) Redacted per 22 NYCRR Redacted per 22 NYCRR §202.5(e) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.