Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Ebony S Owens, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Yaniv, Daniel, against Andre R Morrison, in the jurisdiction of Rockland County, NY, . Rockland County, NY Superior Courts Rockland County Supreme Court with Robert M Berliner presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert M Berliner Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 19, 2020 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Uncontested |
Last RefreshedApril 24, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationRockland County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court HouseRockland County Supreme Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 24, 2022 | COURT NOTICE | ||
March 24, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
March 24, 2022 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - TO COURT | ||
March 22, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
March 22, 2022 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - TO COURT | ||
March 21, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
March 10, 2022 | COURT NOTICE | ||
March 10, 2022 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - TO COURT | ||
January 26, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
January 25, 2022 | COURT NOTICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.