Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Lakeview Loan Servicing Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Sposato, Melissa A., against Laura Faranda, Paul Faranda, in the jurisdiction of Rockland County. This case was filed in Rockland County Superior Courts Rockland County Supreme Court with _ Fsp-R presiding.
Case Number |
Judge_ Fsp-R Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateMarch 29, 2017 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 06, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationRockland County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Filing Court HouseRockland County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time169 days |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: March 29, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 10, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 27, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 14, 2017 | Hearing |
Settled - Other Foreclosure Set. PT.(Rockland) Supreme Trial, SOD (Conversion) Judge: Part (Rockland), Foreclosure Set |
|
July 13, 2017 | Docket Event | CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY / LIS PENDENS | |
July 13, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) | |
July 13, 2017 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION | |
June 29, 2017 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION | |
June 29, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | |
June 29, 2017 | Docket Event | CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY / LIS PENDENS | |
June 23, 2017 | Hearing |
Continued Foreclosure Set. PT.(Rockland) Supreme Initial (first time on), FCP@10:00AM (Conversion) Judge: Part (Rockland), Foreclosure Set |
|
June 02, 2017 | Docket Event | COURT NOTICE | |
May 24, 2017 | Docket Event | RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.