Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Anabella Cervantes, Mendes Dumingo Huales, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Magrino, Robert V, against Colonial Property Management, Llc, represented by Licata, James D, in the jurisdiction of Rockland County, NY, . Rockland County, NY Superior Courts Rockland County Supreme Court with Linda Jamieson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLinda Jamieson Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateApril 28, 2011 |
CategoryTort |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationRockland County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseRockland County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time413 days |
COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: May 31, 2011NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION
Date: October 21, 2011ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S)
Date: October 21, 2011Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 14, 2012 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance |
|
May 10, 2012 | Docket Event |
ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER entered in the office of the County Clerk on May 10, 2012 |
|
May 03, 2012 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI) | |
March 22, 2012 | Docket Event | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | |
February 24, 2012 | Docket Event | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | |
December 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION Combined Demands for Discovery |
|
December 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND Response to Notice for Disc and Insp |
|
October 21, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION | |
October 21, 2011 | Docket Event | ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S) | |
June 06, 2011 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.