Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Kara Silverman An Infant By Her Father And Natural Guardian Noel Silverman, filed a(n) Tort case represented by Stone, Richard P, against Paragon School Of Artistic Gymnastics, Inc., represented by Suk, Janet W, Warner, Jarett Lawrence, in the jurisdiction of Rockland County, NY, . Rockland County, NY Superior Courts Rockland County Supreme Court with Robert M Berliner presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert M Berliner Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateApril 26, 2011 |
CategoryTort |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
||
Filing LocationRockland County, NY |
||
Filing Court HouseRockland County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time1024 days |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: February 28, 2012SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: April 26, 2011STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 13, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 13, 2014 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | |
February 13, 2014 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | |
February 13, 2014 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
December 05, 2013 | Docket Event |
ORDER - INFANT COMPROMISE (Motion #001) INFANT COMPROMISE ORDER entered in the office of the County Clerk on December 05, 2013 |
|
May 16, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PETITION (Motion #001) | |
February 28, 2012 | Docket Event |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE confirming adjournment of preliminary conference |
|
February 24, 2012 | Docket Event | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | |
February 16, 2012 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | |
February 16, 2012 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
February 16, 2012 | Docket Event | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.