Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Rudy Ramirez, filed a(n) Tort case represented by Bernstein, Arnold, against Marco A Beltranena-Lemus, R L Lemus-Deruballso, in the jurisdiction of Rockland County, NY, . Rockland County, NY Superior Courts with William A Kelly presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilliam A Kelly Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 12, 2011 |
CategoryTort |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationRockland County, NY |
|
Case Cycle Time2026 days |
ORDER - OTHER
Date: October 06, 2011SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: April 12, 2011NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: October 07, 2011Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 28, 2016 | Hearing |
OTHER FINAL DISP. PRE-NOTE WILLIAM A. KELLY Judge: HON. WILLIAM A. KELLY |
|
November 21, 2011 |
ORDER - OTHER OTHER ORDER entered in the office of the County Clerk on November 21, 2011 |
||
November 07, 2011 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED-OPEN APPEARANCE (Motion #002) WILLIAM A. KELLY (MOTIONS) RENEW Judge: HON. WILLIAM A. KELLY |
|
October 07, 2011 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #002) Motion to renew -summary judgment |
||
October 07, 2011 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #002) Motion for summary judgment |
||
October 07, 2011 | Motion |
REARGUE/RENEW/RESETTLE/RECONSI (Motion #002) Decided: 11/16/2011DECISION DATE Before Justice: HON. WILLIAM A. KELLY Answer demanded: No Judge: HON. WILLIAM A. KELLY |
|
October 06, 2011 |
ORDER - OTHER OTHER ORDER entered in the office of the County Clerk on October 06, 2011 |
||
October 03, 2011 | Motion |
SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Motion #001) Decided: 10/03/2011DECISION DATE Before Justice: HON. WILLIAM A. KELLY Answer demanded: No Judge: HON. WILLIAM A. KELLY |
|
October 03, 2011 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED-OPEN APPEARANCE (Motion #001) WILLIAM A. KELLY (MOTIONS) Judge: HON. WILLIAM A. KELLY |
|
September 23, 2011 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) MSJ |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.