Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Frank A Kravitz, Jeral Jewelers, Inc., Northeastern Gold Purchasing Service, Inc., filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Crawford, Allyn James, Magnotti, Joseph E., Piken, Robert W, against James F Merlis, in the jurisdiction of Richmond County, NY, . Richmond County, NY Superior Courts Richmond County Supreme Court with Kim Dollard presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKim Dollard Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJune 24, 2015 |
CategoryCommercial |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 18, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationRichmond County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
|
Filing Court HouseRichmond County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time996 days |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: November 27, 2017STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: September 20, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #002)
Date: February 02, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 16, 2018 | Motion |
COMPEL (Motion #002) Decided: 03/16/2018MARKED OFF Before Justice: HON. KIM DOLLARD Answer demanded: No Judge: HON. KIM DOLLARD |
|
March 16, 2018 | Hearing |
MARKED OFF (Motion #002) DCM PART 4M Judge: HON. KIM DOLLARD |
|
February 02, 2018 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #002) | |
February 02, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #002) | |
February 02, 2018 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #002) | |
February 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #002) RESPONSE TO SO ORDERED STIP |
|
February 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #002) PORTIONS OF MERLIS TRANSCRIPT |
|
February 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #002) VERIFIED ANSWER |
|
February 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #002) SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT |
|
February 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #002) STIPULATION/ORDER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.