Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Dominique Billy, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Gansberg, Eric M., against Ivan Billy Jr, in the jurisdiction of Richmond County, NY, . Richmond County, NY Superior Courts with Ralph Porzio presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRalph Porzio Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 02, 2021 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Contested |
Last RefreshedAugust 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationRichmond County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 28, 2022 | ORDER - OTHER | ||
February 28, 2022 | EXHIBIT(S) | ||
January 27, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
January 27, 2022 | STATEMENT OF NET WORTH | ||
December 15, 2021 | ORDER - OTHER | ||
December 14, 2021 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
December 14, 2021 | NOTICE OF DEFAULT | ||
December 14, 2021 | ORDER - OTHER | ||
December 14, 2021 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
December 03, 2021 | STATEMENT OF NET WORTH |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.