Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Jervin Mondesir, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Drantivy, Edwin, against Gregory M Mondesir, in the jurisdiction of Richmond County, NY, . Richmond County, NY Superior Courts with Dennis Owens presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDennis Owens Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 07, 2021 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Uncontested |
Last RefreshedDecember 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationRichmond County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 23, 2023 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
February 21, 2023 | FINDINGS OF FACT/CONCLUSIONS OF LAW - SIGNED | ||
February 21, 2023 | JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE | ||
September 14, 2022 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT (FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID) | ||
September 07, 2022 | COURT NOTICE | ||
July 18, 2022 | SWORN STATEMENT OF REMOVAL OF BARRIERS TO REMARRIAGE | ||
July 13, 2022 | COURT NOTICE | ||
April 20, 2022 | MATRIMONIAL ADDENDUM (840M) | ||
April 20, 2022 | RJI -RE: UNCONTESTED MATRIMONIAL ACTION | ||
April 20, 2022 | JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE (PROPOSED) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.