Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
George Haramis, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Hurtado, Patty, Benzenberg, Amanda Elizabeth, Coscia, Michael A, against Marissa Haramis, represented by Berliner, Ian Craig, Zagika, Olga, Cohen, Francine Pickett, in the jurisdiction of Richmond County, NY, . Richmond County, NY Superior Courts with Ronald Castorina presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRonald Castorina Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 27, 2021 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Contested |
Last RefreshedFebruary 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationRichmond County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 28, 2023 | ORDER APPROVING ATTORNEY FOR THE CHILD(REN) COMPENSATION UCS882 (PROPOSED) | ||
February 21, 2023 | ORDER - OTHER | ||
February 21, 2023 | ORDER - PROTECTION | ||
February 15, 2023 | TRIAL - STIPULATED FACTS | ||
February 15, 2023 | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | ||
February 14, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
February 14, 2023 | ORDER - OTHER | ||
February 14, 2023 | ORDER - PROTECTION (TEMPORARY) | ||
February 13, 2023 | EXHIBIT(S) - B | ||
February 13, 2023 | EXHIBIT(S) - A |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.