Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Ferraro Foods Inc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Benedetto, Nicholas, against Anton Gjini, Ny Family Pizza Inc D B A Ny Family Pizza, in the jurisdiction of Richmond County, NY, . Richmond County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 23, 2021 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationRichmond County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 23, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: September 23, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: September 23, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 24, 2021 | JUDGMENT entered in the office of the County Clerk on November 24, 2021 | ||
November 23, 2021 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
November 22, 2021 | Affirmation of non-military | ||
November 22, 2021 | affidavit of additional mailing | ||
October 13, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
September 23, 2021 |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Verified Summons and Complaint |
||
September 23, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Contract Agreement |
||
September 23, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B Transaction History |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.