Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Camille Ferrante, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Devora, Glen, against Area Seaview Llc, Cardiovascular Associates Of Staten Island Llc, City Of New York, New York City Department Of Parks And Recreation, New York City Department Of Transportation, (total of 5) See All represented by Counsel, Corporation, Famulari, Gianna M., Veras, Michael Joseph, in the jurisdiction of Richmond County, NY, . Richmond County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 23, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Other (Trip And Fall On Premises) |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationRichmond County, NY |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 23, 2021ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: October 15, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: October 04, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 28, 2021 |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) stip of discontinuance |
||
December 01, 2021 |
ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) answer, demands |
||
October 15, 2021 | ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) | ||
October 04, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
October 04, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
September 23, 2021 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.