Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Dawn M. Auerbach, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Kuczinski, Gregory, against Robert F. Dunn, represented by Choe, Steve Hong Suk, in the jurisdiction of Richmond County, NY, . Richmond County, NY Superior Courts with Paul Marrone presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePaul Marrone Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 21, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationRichmond County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 21, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 01, 2022ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: March 17, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 01, 2022 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
November 01, 2022 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
May 10, 2022 |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND Defendant's Response to D & I |
||
March 17, 2022 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
March 04, 2022 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
December 22, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
December 22, 2021 | ANSWER | ||
December 02, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
September 21, 2021 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.