Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Audrey Vesce, Peter Vesce, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Gervasi, Michael Vincent, Tricorico, Marina, against Richmond Medical Center D B A Richmond Universtiy Medical Center, represented by Ginsberg, Jason David, Mastro, William Francis, in the jurisdiction of Richmond County, NY, . Richmond County, NY Superior Courts with Ronald Castorina presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRonald Castorina Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 20, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (Trip And Fall) |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationRichmond County, NY |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 20, 2021CONSENT TO EFILING
Date: September 20, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: October 22, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 19, 2023 |
ORDER - OTHER Short form order |
||
April 05, 2023 |
ORDER - OTHER Short form order |
||
February 22, 2023 |
ORDER - OTHER Short form order |
||
December 07, 2022 |
ORDER - OTHER Short form order |
||
September 16, 2022 |
ORDER - OTHER Short form order |
||
September 16, 2022 | SUBPOENA - SO ORDERED | ||
August 09, 2022 |
DEMAND FOR: Combined demands |
||
August 09, 2022 | NOTICE OF DEPOSITION | ||
August 09, 2022 |
DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS Demand for a verified bill of particulars as to affirmative defenses |
||
June 06, 2022 |
SUBPOENA ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) Possible SSN Administratively Redacted |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.