Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Robert Olechowski, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Simon, Lawrence Michael, Youngworth-Wright, Logan, against A Arteaga Hernand Santos, Declan Treanor, Miranda Mario Castro, represented by Anziano, Christina Louise, Lombardi, Frank D., in the jurisdiction of Richmond County, NY, . Richmond County, NY Superior Courts with Catherine M Didomenico presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCatherine M Didomenico Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 20, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedOctober 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationRichmond County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 20, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: January 20, 2022STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: May 11, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: August 09, 2022ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: May 25, 2022ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: September 26, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: May 25, 2022PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: September 19, 2022COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: December 01, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 21, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 13, 2021ANSWER
Date: January 20, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 29, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 13, 2021SUMMONS - SUPPLEMENTAL (PRE RJI)
Date: December 01, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 29, 2021RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: August 01, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: February 20, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: April 03, 2023STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: August 23, 2023NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI)
Date: April 03, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 23, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 23, 2023 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) | ||
August 23, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
April 03, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
April 03, 2023 | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI) | ||
February 20, 2023 |
DEMAND FOR: Discovery |
||
September 26, 2022 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
September 19, 2022 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED) | ||
August 09, 2022 | COURT NOTICE | ||
August 01, 2022 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
May 25, 2022 | ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.