Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Judeline Toussaint, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Simon, Lawrence Michael, against Alexander Petillo, Michael Petillo, in the jurisdiction of Richmond County, NY, . Richmond County, NY Superior Courts with Ralph Porzio presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRalph Porzio Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 20, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedDecember 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationRichmond County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 20, 2021ANSWER
Date: November 11, 2021STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: May 04, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: January 26, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: June 27, 2022STIPULATION - DISCOVERY ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: April 25, 2022ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: February 02, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 27, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 27, 2021RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: January 03, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: January 05, 2022PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: February 01, 2022ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE
Date: January 26, 2022PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: January 03, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 27, 2022STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: December 27, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: November 29, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 29, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: September 20, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 27, 2022 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
December 27, 2022 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
September 20, 2022 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
June 27, 2022 |
DEMAND FOR: Post EBT Demand for Discovery |
||
May 04, 2022 | STIPULATION - SO ORDERED | ||
April 25, 2022 |
STIPULATION - DISCOVERY ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) So Ordered Stipulation as Per Status Conference |
||
February 02, 2022 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
February 01, 2022 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED) | ||
January 26, 2022 | COURT NOTICE | ||
January 26, 2022 | ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.