Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Barry'S Auto Body Of Ny Llc, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Rafter, Andrew Ashton, against Robert Almo, Sca Appraisal Company Aka Sca Appraisals, Aka Sca Claim Services, Sca Enterprises Inc., represented by Fanizzi, Thomas Robert, Salvo, Joseph, in the jurisdiction of Richmond County, NY, . Richmond County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 17, 2021 |
CategoryCommercial - Business Entity |
Last RefreshedJuly 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationRichmond County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 17, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 18, 2021STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: November 29, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 20, 2022 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) | ||
December 29, 2021 | STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER | ||
November 29, 2021 |
STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER Stip further extending time to answer |
||
November 02, 2021 | STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER | ||
October 19, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service on SCA Enterprises Inc. |
||
October 18, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service on Robert Almo |
||
September 17, 2021 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.