Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Aissatou Diouck, Andrea Constantino, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Bush, Michael H., against William Miguel Corretjer, represented by Barbakoff, Dean Alan, in the jurisdiction of Richmond County, NY, . Richmond County, NY Superior Courts with Ralph Porzio presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRalph Porzio Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 01, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedJuly 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationRichmond County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 01, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 08, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 23, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 29, 2021ANSWER
Date: November 29, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: January 04, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: January 04, 2022RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: December 23, 2021PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: February 14, 2022PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: December 23, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: December 23, 2021ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE
Date: January 26, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 21, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 21, 2021ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: February 14, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: January 26, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: February 15, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: June 21, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: August 09, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: March 31, 2022BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: December 21, 2021STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: December 19, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 19, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 19, 2022 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
December 19, 2022 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
August 09, 2022 |
DEMAND FOR: OS Discovery-Letter of Good Faith |
||
June 21, 2022 |
DEMAND FOR: OS Discovery-Letter of Good Faith |
||
March 31, 2022 |
DEMAND FOR: Discovery-Post EBT |
||
February 15, 2022 |
DEMAND FOR: OS Discovery-Letter of Good Faith |
||
February 14, 2022 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED) | ||
February 14, 2022 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
January 26, 2022 | ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE | ||
January 26, 2022 | COURT NOTICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.