Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Nicholas Imperato, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Fitzgerald, Michael David, against Joseph George Lanza, Kelly Lanza, represented by Adkins, Justin Scott, Blascetta, Margaret G., Lesperance, Nicole Emley, in the jurisdiction of Richmond County, NY, . Richmond County, NY Superior Courts with Lizette Colon presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLizette Colon Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 27, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationRichmond County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 27, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: September 24, 2021ANSWER
Date: September 24, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 02, 2022 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
September 16, 2022 |
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001) dated 9-15-22 |
||
September 16, 2022 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
September 14, 2022 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
September 09, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY | ||
September 01, 2022 | RESPONSE TO STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS | ||
September 01, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION | ||
August 12, 2022 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
August 12, 2022 |
DEMAND FOR: TRIAL AUTHORIZATIONS |
||
August 12, 2022 |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND Expert Witness Disclosure - "Otolaryngology" Redacted per 22 NYCRR Expert Witness Disclosure - "Otolaryngology" Redacted |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.