Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Janine R. Pitta-Horowitz, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Petersson, Everett John, against Liberty Mutual Insurance, represented by Mastoros, James, in the jurisdiction of Richmond County, NY, . Richmond County, NY Superior Courts with Ronald Castorina presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRonald Castorina Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 25, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Other (Contracts) |
Last RefreshedNovember 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationRichmond County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 25, 2021MEMORANDUM
Date: May 16, 2023STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: October 11, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 11, 2023 |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance |
||
September 20, 2023 | COURT NOTICE | ||
August 02, 2023 |
ORDER - TRIAL SCHEDULING Short form order |
||
June 13, 2023 |
NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY Note of Issue |
||
June 13, 2023 | ORDER - CERTIFICATION | ||
May 16, 2023 |
MEMORANDUM Good faith letter for discovery |
||
May 10, 2023 | ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE | ||
March 30, 2023 |
ORDER - OTHER Short form order |
||
February 15, 2023 |
ORDER - OTHER Short form order |
||
January 31, 2023 |
DEMAND FOR: Post EBT Demands for Discovery and Inspection |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.