Case Last Refreshed: 1 day ago
Barbara Flores, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Gekman, Zoya, against Luis Santiago, represented by Garrison, Michelle L, in the jurisdiction of Richmond County, NY, . Richmond County, NY Superior Courts Supreme with Ralph Porzio presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRalph Porzio Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 17, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedApril 24, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationRichmond County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseSupreme |
This complaint is a legal document filed in the Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Richmond. The plaintiff, Barbara Flores, is suing the defendant, Luis Santiago, for damages resulting from a motor vehicle accident. The complaint alleg...
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: June 10, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: October 06, 2021ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: May 10, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: April 26, 2022RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: September 29, 2021ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: October 27, 2021SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: April 26, 2022PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: October 21, 2021ANSWER
Date: August 02, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 02, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 04, 2021ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE
Date: October 06, 2021SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 17, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 10, 2022 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
May 10, 2022 | ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE | ||
April 26, 2022 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
April 26, 2022 | SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY (POST RJI) | ||
October 27, 2021 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
October 21, 2021 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED) | ||
October 06, 2021 | COURT NOTICE | ||
October 06, 2021 | ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE | ||
September 29, 2021 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
August 04, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.