Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Isaia Garcia, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Gustman, Brian Ross, against Koron Tarantola, represented by Anziano, Christina Louise, Derrick, Amber Nicole, in the jurisdiction of Richmond County, NY, . Richmond County, NY Superior Courts with Ralph Porzio presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRalph Porzio Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 14, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedNovember 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationRichmond County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 14, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: June 28, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 03, 2021ANSWER
Date: August 03, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 28, 2021NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION
Date: March 08, 2022ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: August 23, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: February 21, 2022RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: August 12, 2021PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: August 12, 2021RESPONSE TO DEMAND Expert Witness Disclosure Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: January 03, 2022NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION
Date: August 03, 2021NOTICE TO ADMIT
Date: August 03, 2021RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: October 05, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: August 16, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 16, 2022NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION
Date: October 20, 2021STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: August 16, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: October 04, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 16, 2022 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
August 16, 2022 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
March 08, 2022 |
NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION Post EBT Demand 3.8.2022 |
||
February 21, 2022 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Good Faith Correspondence Defendant EBT/Supplemental Demand for Discovery and Inspection |
||
January 03, 2022 |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND Expert Witness Disclosure Redacted per 22 NYCRR Expert Witness Disclosure Redacted |
||
November 05, 2021 | Hearing |
IAS Part 10
Judge: Porzio, Ralph J. |
|
October 20, 2021 |
NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION Plaintiff's Supplemental Demand for Discovery and Inspection |
||
October 05, 2021 | Response to Demand for Medical Reports 10.5.21. | ||
October 05, 2021 |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND RESPONSE TO DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION RESPONSE TO PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER AND DEMAND RESPONSE TO DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION RESPONSE TO PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER AND DEMAND ... show more |
||
October 04, 2021 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Good Faith Correspondence |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.