Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Carolyn Nollez, Vincent Nollez, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Devora, Glen, against City Of New York, Martha Torres Vengoechea, New York City Department Of Parks And Recreation, New York City Department Of Transportation, Pablo E. Vengoechea, (total of 5) See All represented by Counsel, Corporation, Famulari, Gianna M., Shapiro, Adam Philip, in the jurisdiction of Richmond County, NY, . Richmond County, NY Superior Courts with Orlando Marrazzo presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeOrlando Marrazzo Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 07, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Other (Premises) |
Last RefreshedNovember 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationRichmond County, NY |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 07, 2021ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: September 21, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: June 24, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 15, 2022 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
September 15, 2022 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
December 14, 2021 | NOTICE TO ADMIT | ||
November 08, 2021 | ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING | ||
October 30, 2021 |
BILL OF PARTICULARS Nollez Vincent-Verified bill of Particulars |
||
October 30, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT Nollez Vincent- Affidavit of service |
||
October 30, 2021 |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST Nollez Vincent-Request for Preliminary Conference |
||
October 30, 2021 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
September 21, 2021 |
ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) and Counter-Claim |
||
June 24, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.