Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Christina Lavista, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Wickman, Victoria, against Jefferson Homes, Llc, Nnt Development Corp., represented by Abilheira, Elias, in the jurisdiction of Richmond County, NY, . Richmond County, NY Superior Courts with Lizette Colon presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLizette Colon Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 02, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (Premises Slip And Fall) |
Last RefreshedNovember 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationRichmond County, NY |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 02, 2021STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: June 26, 2023NOTICE OF APPEAL/INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: April 04, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE *Corrected*
Date: May 18, 2023ORDER - OTHER
Date: March 06, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 06, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 06, 2023ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: March 16, 2022PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: September 29, 2021ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: October 07, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED ) *Corrected*
Date: September 29, 2022NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY
Date: October 27, 2022BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: September 29, 2021ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: August 08, 2022NOTICE
Date: September 28, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED ) *Corrected*
Date: August 05, 2022NOTICE
Date: August 01, 2022ANSWER
Date: September 14, 2021RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: September 29, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: February 28, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 28, 2021ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: November 05, 2021COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: March 15, 2022ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE
Date: February 28, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 14, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 21, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 21, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: February 21, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: February 21, 2023RESPONSE TO STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS
Date: February 21, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 21, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 26, 2023 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
May 18, 2023 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE *Corrected* Settlement Notice to Court |
||
April 04, 2023 |
NOTICE OF APPEAL/INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE Possible SSN Administratively Redacted |
||
March 06, 2023 |
ORDER - OTHER DATED 3-6-23 DIRECT SELECT ORDER |
||
March 06, 2023 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #001) Notice of Entry of Summary Judgment Order dated 03-06-2023 |
||
March 06, 2023 |
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001) DATED 3 -6-23 |
||
February 21, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Transcript |
||
February 21, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Opposition |
||
February 21, 2023 |
RESPONSE TO STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Response to Statement Undisputed Material Facts |
||
February 21, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.