Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Vincent Pisacani, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Bush, Michael H., against Anthony P. Sciandra And Carmela Cunsalo Trustees Of The Salvatore Sciandra Irrevocable Trust, Anthony P. Sciandra And Carmela Cunsalo Trustees Of The Salvatore Sciandra Irrevocable Trust, Sciandra Family Limited Partnership, Top Tomato Plaza Llc, represented by Kolbe, George S, in the jurisdiction of Richmond County, NY, . Richmond County, NY Superior Courts with Paul Marrone presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePaul Marrone Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 25, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Other (Trip And Fall) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationRichmond County, NY |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: May 25, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: September 27, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 21, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 15, 2023 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
September 27, 2022 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
September 27, 2022 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
September 27, 2022 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED) | ||
May 23, 2022 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
May 11, 2022 | Answer to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint | ||
April 25, 2022 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED) (Motion #001) return date amended |
||
April 21, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) Affidavit of service |
||
April 21, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Summons & Complaint |
||
April 21, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.