Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Santander Bank, N.A, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Boriskin, Sara Z., against New York City Environmental Control Board, New York State Department Of Taxation And Finance, Susan T. Bagley, Heir And Distributee Under The Estate Of Diane Epps Aka Diane Sheila Epps And Heir And Distributee Under The Estate Of Lillie Epps, Susan T. Bagley Heir And Sole Distributee To The Estate Of Dianne Epps A Ka Diane Epp A K K Diane Sheila Epps, The People Of The State Of New York, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Richmond County, NY, . Richmond County, NY Superior Courts Richmond County Supreme Court with Desmond A Green presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDesmond A Green Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateAugust 28, 2015 |
CategoryForeclosure (Residential Mortgage) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1061 days |
Filing LocationRichmond County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Filing Court HouseRichmond County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time1061 days |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: November 05, 2018ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - DECLINED/WITHDRAWN
Date: December 03, 2018ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001)
Date: November 10, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 10, 2019 | Hearing |
PD - NO SALE FORECLOSURE AUCTION PART Judge: DESMOND A. GREEN |
|
September 16, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SALE | |
December 03, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - DECLINED/WITHDRAWN | |
November 15, 2018 | Hearing |
PD - NO SALE FORECLOSURE AUCTION PART Judge: DESMOND A. GREEN |
|
November 05, 2018 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP | |
November 05, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) | |
October 25, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SALE | |
August 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affirmation of service |
|
August 22, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of entry | |
July 24, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER AND JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE & SALE (Motion #002) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.