Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Hsbc Bank Usa, National Association, As Trustee For Ace Securities Corp. Home Equity Loan Trust, Series 2006-Nc1, Asset Backed Pass-Through Certificates, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Sposato, Melissa A., Wallace, Lisa L, against Andrew Adlerstein, Silvia Adlerstein, in the jurisdiction of Richmond County, NY, . Richmond County, NY Superior Courts Richmond County Supreme Court with Residential Foreclosure Part presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeResidential Foreclosure Part Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateAugust 27, 2015 |
CategoryForeclosure (Residential Mortgage) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationRichmond County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Filing Court HouseRichmond County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time1230 days |
ORDER - REFERENCE (Motion #001)
Date: April 05, 2017LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #002)
Date: June 29, 2017NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #003)
Date: December 05, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aos andrew adlerstein |
|
January 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION |
|
January 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aom occupant |
|
January 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aom andrew adlerstein |
|
June 06, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY | |
May 11, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY (Motion #003) | |
January 19, 2018 | Motion |
DISCONTINUE ACTION (Motion #003) Decided: 01/19/2018ORDER ATTACHED Before Justice: RESIDENTIAL FORECLOSURE PT Answer demanded: No Judge: RESIDENTIAL FORECLOSURE PT |
|
January 19, 2018 | Hearing |
ORDER ATTACHED (Motion #003) RES FORECLOSURE PART MOTIONS Judge: RESIDENTIAL FORECLOSURE PT |
|
December 21, 2017 | Hearing |
MOTION WITHDRAWN (Motion #002) RES FORECLOSURE PART MOTIONS PER EFILE DOC #32 Judge: RESIDENTIAL FORECLOSURE PT |
|
December 05, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #003) Noice of Motion |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.