Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Bank Of America, N.A., filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Brickley, Daniel Edward, Katz, Jordan S, Modica, Tyne Regina, West, Susan A, against Kim Kogut Aka Kim D. Kogut, Michael Kogut, Nyc Parking Violations Bureau, Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc, Woodbrooke Estates Condominium Section I Board Of Managers, (total of 5) See All represented by Fiore, Marguerite Angela, Meyers, Jay Andrew, in the jurisdiction of Richmond County, NY, . Richmond County, NY Superior Courts Richmond County Supreme Court with Residential Foreclosure Part presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeResidential Foreclosure Part Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateAugust 12, 2015 |
CategoryForeclosure (Residential Mortgage) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1461 days |
Filing LocationRichmond County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Filing Court HouseRichmond County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time1461 days |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001)
Date: October 27, 2016ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #003)
Date: November 15, 2019JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE
Date: August 12, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 24, 2020 | Motion |
DISCONTINUE ACTION (Motion #004) Before Justice: RESIDENTIAL FORECLOSURE PT Answer demanded: No Judge: RESIDENTIAL FORECLOSURE PT |
|
September 24, 2020 | Hearing |
PD MOT - ORDER ATTACHED RES FORECLOSURE PART MOTIONS Judge: RESIDENTIAL FORECLOSURE PT |
|
April 16, 2020 | Hearing |
PD - NO SALE FORECLOSURE AUCTION PART SUSPEND Judge: RESIDENTIAL FORECLOSURE PT |
|
December 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER - OTHER (Motion #003) EXTENSION OF TIME TO SELL |
|
December 19, 2019 | Hearing |
PD - NO SALE FORECLOSURE AUCTION PART 2:00PM Judge: RESIDENTIAL FORECLOSURE PT |
|
December 11, 2019 | Motion |
EXTEND TIME (Motion #003) Decided: 12/11/2019PD MOT - ORDER ATTACHED Before Justice: RESIDENTIAL FORECLOSURE PT Answer demanded: No Judge: RESIDENTIAL FORECLOSURE PT |
|
December 11, 2019 | Hearing |
PD MOT - ORDER ATTACHED RES FORECLOSURE PART MOTIONS Judge: RESIDENTIAL FORECLOSURE PT |
|
November 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #003) ORDER |
|
November 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #003) NOTICE OF MOTION TO EXTEND TIME FOR REFEREE TO CONDUCT SALE |
|
November 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #003) ATTORNEY AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.