Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
United Mortgage Corp, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Cascino, Margaret Jaffe, Corey, Catherine Lindsay, Weisblatt, Stacey Allyson, against Board Of Managers Of Avon At Great Kills Condominium, Carl Tuminello, Janet Gilkson, Td Bank, N.A., Teresa Tuminello, (total of 5) See All represented by Crawford, Allyn James, in the jurisdiction of Richmond County, NY, . Richmond County, NY Superior Courts Richmond County Supreme Court with Residential Foreclosure Part presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeResidential Foreclosure Part Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateAugust 07, 2015 |
CategoryForeclosure (Residential Mortgage) |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationRichmond County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Filing Court HouseRichmond County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time103 days |
ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY (Motion #002)
Date: February 27, 2018SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 07, 2015STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 20, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #002)
Date: December 01, 2017NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: December 01, 2017NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: May 13, 2016ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001)
Date: May 13, 2016ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #002)
Date: December 01, 2017ORDER - REFERENCE (Motion #001)
Date: March 22, 2017LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: September 15, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 27, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY (Motion #002) | |
December 15, 2017 | Motion |
DISCONTINUE ACTION (Motion #002) Decided: 12/15/2017ORDER ATTACHED Before Justice: RESIDENTIAL FORECLOSURE PT Answer demanded: No Judge: RESIDENTIAL FORECLOSURE PT |
|
December 15, 2017 | Hearing |
ORDER ATTACHED (Motion #002) RES FORECLOSURE PART MOTIONS Judge: RESIDENTIAL FORECLOSURE PT |
|
December 15, 2017 | Hearing |
PD - DISCONTINUED RESIDENTIAL FORECLOSURE PART 2:15PM Judge: RESIDENTIAL FORECLOSURE PT |
|
December 01, 2017 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #002) | |
December 01, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #002) | |
December 01, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #002) | |
December 01, 2017 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #002) | |
December 01, 2017 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #002) Order of Reference |
|
December 01, 2017 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #002) Notice of Pendency |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.