Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Nationstar Mortgage Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Michalek, Sarah A, against Hsbc Bank Usa, N.A., Maryann Gambino, Paul J Gambino, represented by Wrazen, Brandon Michael, in the jurisdiction of Richmond County, NY, . Richmond County, NY Superior Courts Richmond County Supreme Court with Residential Foreclosure Part presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeResidential Foreclosure Part Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateAugust 04, 2015 |
CategoryForeclosure (Residential Mortgage) |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions776 days |
Filing LocationRichmond County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Filing Court HouseRichmond County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time1058 days |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: October 29, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: January 07, 2016SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 04, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 26, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CLAIM TO SURPLUS MONIES | |
June 20, 2019 | Hearing |
PD - UPSET DEPOSITED FORECLOSURE AUCTION PART CONTROL Judge: RESIDENTIAL FORECLOSURE PT |
|
June 12, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
June 12, 2019 | Docket Event | CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI) | |
May 14, 2019 | Docket Event | RECEIPT OF PAYMENT INTO COURT | |
May 09, 2019 | Docket Event | REFEREE REPORT OF SALE | |
May 09, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
May 09, 2019 | Docket Event | FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM | |
March 12, 2019 | Docket Event | FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM | |
March 07, 2019 | Hearing |
PD - SURPLUS FORECLOSURE AUCTION PART CONTROL Judge: RESIDENTIAL FORECLOSURE PT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.