Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Cohn, Michael Holliday, Di Caro, John A, against Board Of Managers Of The Sandywoods Homeowners Association, Inc., Citibank, N.A., City Of New York Environmental Control Board, City Of New York Parking Violations Bureau, City Of New York Transit Adjudication Bureau, (total of 9) See All in the jurisdiction of Richmond County, NY, . Richmond County, NY Superior Courts Richmond County Supreme Court with Conference Part Foreclosure presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeConference Part Foreclosure Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateOctober 23, 2015 |
CategoryForeclosure (Residential Mortgage) |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 17, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationRichmond County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Filing Court HouseRichmond County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time424 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 30, 2016 | Hearing |
FSC - SETTLED: LOAN MOD (U) FORECLOSURE CONFERENCE PART 930AM Judge: FORECLOSURE CONFERENCE |
|
August 09, 2016 | Hearing |
FSC - CONTINUED (U) FORECLOSURE CONFERENCE PART 230PM Judge: FORECLOSURE CONFERENCE |
|
May 13, 2016 | Hearing |
FSC - CONTINUED (U) FORECLOSURE CONFERENCE PART 930AM Judge: FORECLOSURE CONFERENCE |
|
March 18, 2016 | Hearing |
FSC - CONTINUED (U) FORECLOSURE CONFERENCE PART 930AM Judge: FORECLOSURE CONFERENCE |
|
January 15, 2016 | Hearing |
FSC - CONTINUED (U) FORECLOSURE CONFERENCE PART 930AM Judge: FORECLOSURE CONFERENCE |
|
November 20, 2015 | Hearing |
FSC - CONTINUED (U) FORECLOSURE CONFERENCE PART 930AM Judge: FORECLOSURE CONFERENCE |
|
October 23, 2015 | Hearing |
FSC - CONTINUED (U) FORECLOSURE CONFERENCE PART 930AM Judge: FORECLOSURE CONFERENCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.