Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Jpmorgan Chase Bank, National Association, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Britt, Kenneth O, Garza, Len Matthew, Klein, Ashley Akiva, against Asid Rad, City Of New York, New York City Environmental Control Board, City Of New York, Nyc Department Of Finance-Parking Violations Bureau, Hamayoun Rafaqat A K A Hamyoun Rafaqat, John Doe #1 And Jane Doe #1, (total of 10) See All represented by Moshes, Yuriy, in the jurisdiction of Richmond County, NY, . Richmond County, NY Superior Courts with Residential Foreclosure Part presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeResidential Foreclosure Part Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 01, 2015 |
CategoryForeclosure (Residential Mortgage) |
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationRichmond County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Case Cycle Time727 days |
NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: January 08, 2018ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: January 08, 2018STIPULATION - CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: September 13, 2018STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION
Date: February 27, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 08, 2018LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: September 02, 2015LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: June 28, 2018STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: September 13, 2018ORDER - SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: June 25, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 08, 2018MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: January 08, 2018STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 01, 2015STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 14, 2015REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S)
Date: September 11, 2015STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 15, 2015ANSWER
Date: July 27, 2015COMPLAINT (AMENDED) Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: July 02, 2015STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 02, 2015SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: July 01, 2015ANSWER (AMENDED)
Date: August 25, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 19, 2018 | Hearing |
PD - DISCONTINUED RESIDENTIAL FORECLOSURE PART SEE E-FILE DOC#70 DISC Judge: RESIDENTIAL FORECLOSURE PT |
|
September 13, 2018 | STIPULATION - CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY | ||
September 13, 2018 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
September 13, 2018 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
September 13, 2018 |
AFFIRMATION Attorney Affirmation of Kenneth O. Britt, Esq., for Stipulation to Discontinue Action and Stipulatio Attorney Affirmation of Kenneth O. Britt, Esq., for Stipulation to Discontinue Action and Stipulatio ... show more |
||
August 06, 2018 | Hearing |
PD - ADJOURNED RESIDENTIAL FORECLOSURE PART OAT REVIEW-MOTION #1 NO APPEARANCE NEC. Judge: RESIDENTIAL FORECLOSURE PT |
|
June 28, 2018 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
June 25, 2018 | ORDER - SUMMARY JUDGMENT | ||
April 04, 2018 | Hearing |
ORDER ATTACHED (Motion #001) RES FORECLOSURE PART MOTIONS Judge: RESIDENTIAL FORECLOSURE PT |
|
February 28, 2018 | Motion |
REF TO COMPUTE (Motion #001) Decided: 05/23/2018SHORT FORM ORDER Before Justice: RESIDENTIAL FORECLOSURE PT Answer demanded: No Judge: RESIDENTIAL FORECLOSURE PT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.