Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Santander Bank, N.A., filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Fourtner, Tracy Mckay, Nardolillo, Michael William, Polowy, Amy E., Rosenfeld, Steven, against Carmine Castellano, John Doe, Julie Castellano, New York City Environmental Control Board, New York City Parking Violations Bureau, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Richmond County, NY, . Richmond County, NY Superior Courts Richmond County Supreme Court with Residential Foreclosure Part presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeResidential Foreclosure Part Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJune 29, 2015 |
CategoryForeclosure (Residential Mortgage) |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationRichmond County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Filing Court HouseRichmond County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time214 days |
ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY (Motion #002)
Date: December 28, 2016NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: March 09, 2016NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION / ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001)
Date: July 20, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 28, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY (Motion #002) | |
September 29, 2016 | Motion |
REF TO COMPUTE (Motion #001) Decided: 09/29/2016MOTION WITHDRAWN Before Justice: RESIDENTIAL FORECLOSURE PT Answer demanded: No Judge: RESIDENTIAL FORECLOSURE PT |
|
September 29, 2016 | Motion |
DISCONTINUE ACTION (Motion #002) Decided: 09/29/2016ORDER ATTACHED Before Justice: RESIDENTIAL FORECLOSURE PT Answer demanded: No Judge: RESIDENTIAL FORECLOSURE PT |
|
September 29, 2016 | Hearing |
ORDER ATTACHED (Motion #002) RES FORECLOSURE PART MOTIONS Judge: RESIDENTIAL FORECLOSURE PT |
|
September 29, 2016 | Hearing |
MOTION WITHDRAWN (Motion #001) RES FORECLOSURE PART MOTIONS Judge: RESIDENTIAL FORECLOSURE PT |
|
July 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #002) Redacted |
|
July 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #002) Redacted |
|
July 21, 2016 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT (Motion #002) | |
July 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #002) Notice of Appearance/Answer |
|
July 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #002) Summons, Complaint, and Notice of Pendency |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.