Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
The Bank Of New York Mellon F K A The Bank Of New York As Successor In Interest To Jpmorgan Chase Bank, National Association, As Trustee For C-Bass Mortgage Loan Asset-Backed Certificates, Series 2003-Cb6, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Denise Galantro Aka Denise Galatro, Department Of Finance - Internal Revenue Service, John Doe And Jane Doe #1 Through #7, Timothy Lynskey, United States District Court Sdny, (total of 5) See All represented by Schwartz, Beth Patricia, Schwartzman, Steven David, in the jurisdiction of Richmond County, NY, . Richmond County, NY Superior Courts Richmond County Supreme Court with Conference Part Foreclosure presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeConference Part Foreclosure Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJune 26, 2015 |
CategoryForeclosure (Residential Mortgage) |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 17, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationRichmond County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Filing Court HouseRichmond County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time350 days |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: September 02, 2015STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: June 26, 2015SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 26, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 10, 2016 | Docket Event |
CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY / LIS PENDENS *Corrected* Stipulation Cancelling Notice of Pendency |
|
December 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation Discontinuing Action |
|
December 08, 2015 | Hearing |
FSC - DISCONTINUED (U) FORECLOSURE CONFERENCE PART 230PM Judge: FORECLOSURE CONFERENCE |
|
October 28, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) Notice of Appearance and Demand |
|
October 27, 2015 | Hearing |
FSC - CONTINUED (R) FORECLOSURE CONFERENCE PART 230PM Judge: FORECLOSURE CONFERENCE |
|
October 06, 2015 | Hearing |
FSC - CONTINUED (U) FORECLOSURE CONFERENCE PART 230PM Judge: FORECLOSURE CONFERENCE |
|
September 24, 2015 | Docket Event | Answer | |
September 02, 2015 | Docket Event | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | |
August 11, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE US DISTRICT COURT SDNY AOS |
|
August 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE MAILAOS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.