Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Emigrant Bank, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Confusione, Lisa M, against Exeter Holding, Ltd., New York City Environmental Control Board, Sherman & Zalenko, Llc, Sofia Tsoukas, Steve Tsoukas A K A Steven Tsoukas, (total of 6) See All represented by Delli Paoli, Edward Gerald, Mirro, Michele, Schwartz, Beth Patricia, Meyers, Jay Andrew, in the jurisdiction of Richmond County, NY, . Richmond County, NY Superior Courts Richmond County Supreme Court with Residential Foreclosure Part presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeResidential Foreclosure Part Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJune 26, 2015 |
CategoryForeclosure (Residential Mortgage) |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1336 days |
Filing LocationRichmond County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Filing Court HouseRichmond County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time1336 days |
ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: September 05, 2018ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #002)
Date: July 07, 2017NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION / ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: May 08, 2018JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE
Date: February 21, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: September 05, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: September 05, 2018ORDER AND JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE & SALE
Date: February 21, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: August 18, 2015ORDER - REFERENCE
Date: December 23, 2016LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: April 04, 2023NOTICE OF SALE
Date: March 02, 2023CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: June 26, 2015EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001) loan documents Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: February 02, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 02, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 02, 2016AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 02, 2016AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 22, 2015RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: July 24, 2015AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 07, 2015AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 22, 2015AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 22, 2015NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: June 26, 2015AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 22, 2015AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 22, 2015AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 02, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 02, 2016AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 22, 2015EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 02, 2016AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 07, 2015AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 02, 2016AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 24, 2015AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 22, 2015AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 22, 2015NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: July 29, 2015ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE -REQUEST
Date: October 29, 2015EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #002)
Date: July 07, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 02, 2016AFFIDAVIT
Date: July 07, 2017BILL OF COSTS
Date: July 07, 2017AFFIRMATION
Date: July 07, 2017AFFIRMATION OF ATTORNEY FEES
Date: July 07, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: July 07, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: November 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #004) Summons and complaint Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: November 08, 2021ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #004)
Date: November 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #004)
Date: November 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - P Â (Motion #003) REFEREE'S COMPUTATIONS Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: September 05, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002)
Date: July 07, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #003) MORTGAGE AND LOAN MOD Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: September 05, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #003) CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: September 05, 2018NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: June 19, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #003) NOTE Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: September 05, 2018NOTICE OF SALE
Date: March 01, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #003)
Date: September 05, 2018NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: February 22, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: November 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #003) 90 DAY NOTICE Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: September 05, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #002)
Date: July 07, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #003)
Date: September 05, 2018LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: August 18, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 08, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: August 29, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 25, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - S Â (Motion #003)
Date: September 05, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #003)
Date: September 05, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #003)
Date: September 05, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #003) SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: September 05, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #004)
Date: November 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #003)
Date: September 05, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #003) AFFIDAVITS OF MAILING Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: September 05, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 07, 2017CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: December 13, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - Q Â (Motion #003)
Date: September 05, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - R Â (Motion #003)
Date: September 05, 2018NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: October 23, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - O Â (Motion #003)
Date: September 05, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #004)
Date: November 08, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: November 08, 2021BILL OF COSTS
Date: September 05, 2018NOTICE OF SALE
Date: October 25, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #003) DEMAND LETTER Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: September 05, 2018NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI)
Date: January 06, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 05, 2018NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: February 13, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: August 10, 2022ORDER - MOTION - SHORT FORM Â (Motion #004)
Date: February 09, 2023SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: December 13, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: November 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #003) ASSIGNMENT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: September 05, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #003)
Date: September 05, 2018NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND CLAIMS TO SURPLUS MONIES
Date: August 02, 2022NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND CLAIMS TO SURPLUS MONIES
Date: August 19, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #002) *Corrected*
Date: July 07, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: July 07, 2017NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001) *Corrected*
Date: February 02, 2016STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 22, 2015SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 26, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: February 02, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 04, 2023 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
March 02, 2023 | NOTICE OF SALE | ||
February 13, 2023 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
February 09, 2023 |
ORDER - MOTION - SHORT FORM (Motion #004) RELEASE TO AUCTION ORDER |
||
August 19, 2022 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND CLAIMS TO SURPLUS MONIES | ||
August 10, 2022 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
August 02, 2022 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND CLAIMS TO SURPLUS MONIES | ||
December 13, 2021 | CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI) | ||
December 13, 2021 | SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY (POST RJI) | ||
November 15, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A hardship covid declaration |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.